This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/09/2023 at 19:08:10 (UTC).

2018-3 IH BORROWER LP WITH GP 2018-3 IH BORROWER GP LLC V VERBICK, MARY

Case Summary

On 03/30/2023 2018-3 IH BORROWER LP WITH GP 2018-3 IH BORROWER GP LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VERBICK, MARY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

2018-3 IH BORROWER LP WITH GP 2018-3 IH BORROWER GP LLC

Defendants and Respondents

VERBICK , JASON

VERBICK , MARY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

03/30/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4841691

03/31/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4841691

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/10/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/10/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION FOR ORDER

04/10/2023:MOTION FOR ORDER

STIPULATION

04/10/2023:STIPULATION

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34246 PAGE 1534-1534

04/13/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34246 PAGE 1534-1534

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/17/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/17/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE VERIFIED SUBSTITUTE MARY VERBICK - 04/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE VERIFIED SERVED JASON VERBICK - 04/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34246 PAGE 1534-1534; Notes: AND ORDER APPROVING STIP-JUDGE CORLEW DTD 4/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes: PARTIES STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER; Notes: APPROVING STIPULATION & DISMISSAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4841691; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/31/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4841691; Notes: $205.00 4841691 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadings@fl-landlord.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pleadings@fl-landlord.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less