This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/29/2023 at 01:13:49 (UTC).

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V BARTLEY, KEISHA A

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BARTLEY, KEISHA A. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant and Respondent

BARTLEY , KEISHA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ESTEVEZ , KEILA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/23/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/23/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/23/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4908948

05/24/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4908948

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4908948; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/24/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SOUTHFLALITIGATION@ZWICKERPC.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/28/2023 1:30 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/28/2023 1:30 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4908948; Notes: $310.00 4908948 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less