This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/21/2023 at 18:07:44 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V REILLY, LESLIE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REILLY, LESLIE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Respondent and Defendant

REILLY , LESLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PILUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/18/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/18/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4904040

05/19/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4904040

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/19/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: NB; Room: #1 (North Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4904040; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM EMAILED TO THE ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/27/2023 8:45 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/27/2023 8:45 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4904040; Notes: $185.00 4904040 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less