This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/04/2023 at 06:27:05 (UTC).

ZUMPANO, DONALD V WHISPERING WOODS OF PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 ZUMPANO, DONALD filed an Other lawsuit against WHISPERING WOODS OF PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ZUMPANO , CARLENE

ZUMPANO , DONALD

Defendants and Respondents

AT&T CORP

WHISPERING WOODS OF PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRACHTMAN , JOSHUA D

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LLOYD , DEREK H

RENALDO , ANTHONY J

KOWALSKI , DAVID

KOBY , SHAUN

BUDHRAM , KRISTOFFER R

CHAPMAN , BAKER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

03/21/2023:COMPLAINT

DCM DESIGNATION TO THE GENERAL TRACK WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

11/18/2023:DCM DESIGNATION TO THE GENERAL TRACK WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/15/2023:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/15/2023:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/08/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/03/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

10/16/2023:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/12/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/26/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

09/18/2023:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

09/08/2023:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

09/08/2023:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

09/08/2023:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

09/08/2023:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

09/08/2023:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

09/08/2023:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

09/08/2023:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/22/2023:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDCM DESIGNATION TO THE GENERAL TRACK WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER; Notes: G. JOSEPH CURLEY, JR 11/17/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: DEFENDANT'S RE-NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL/ZOOM DEPOSITION DONALD ZUMPANO 02/06/2024 10:00 A.M CARLENE ZUMPANO 02/07/2024 10:00 A.M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DONALD ZUMPANO 02/06/2024 10:00:00 AM CARLENE ZUMPANO 02/07/2024 10:00:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES 109155

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AS COUNSEL FOR AT&T CORP AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY ATTY RENALDO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITIONS 10/17/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURES REGARDING LETTERS OF PROTECTION, PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. S 768.0427

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: SECOND AMENDED AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY SHAUN KOBY OBO DFT WHISPERING WOODS OF PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, AT&T CORPS CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, WHISPERING WOODS OF PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
03/28/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

FinancialDue Date: 03/28/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS - County Civil - CC - SC; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

FinancialDue Date: 03/28/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS - County Civil - CC - SC; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

FinancialDue Date: 03/28/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4834911; Notes: $421.00 4834911 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jsinger@zimmermanfrachtman.com;jfrachtman@zimmermanfrachtman.com;KBerntsen@zimmermanfrachtman.com AS TO WHISPERING WOODS OF PALM BEACH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jsinger@zimmermanfrachtman.com;jfrachtman@zimmermanfrachtman.com;KBerntsen@zimmermanfrachtman.com AS TO AT&T CORP EFILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less