This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/03/2023 at 19:05:56 (UTC).

INVESTMENTS LIMITED V MESSER RESTAURANT, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/25/2023 INVESTMENTS LIMITED filed an Other lawsuit against MESSER RESTAURANT, LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

Defendant and Respondent

MESSER RESTAURANT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LAZAR , JASON M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/25/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/25/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/25/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354

07/25/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354

07/26/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/28/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/28/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354

07/31/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354

07/31/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/31/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

AGREEMENT

07/31/2023:AGREEMENT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

08/02/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

08/02/2023

DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34474 PAGE 1897-1897; Notes: & ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING STIPULATION AGREEMENT JUDGE SILVER ON 8/2/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4982354; Receipt Amount: $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAGREEMENT; Notes: STIPULATION AGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED MESSER RESTAURANT LLC - 07/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354; Notes: $310.00 4982354 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4982354; Notes: 4982354

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354; Notes: $310.00 4982354 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4982354; Notes: 4982354

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354; Notes: $310.00 4982354 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4982354; Notes: 4982354

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4982354; Notes: $310.00 4982354 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: JLAZAR@INVESTMENTSLIMITED.COM; LMORALES@INVESTMENTSLIMITED.COM; BHADERSPOCK@INVESTMENTSLIMITED.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2023; Description: Summons $10 effective 07012023; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less