This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/04/2023 at 17:06:48 (UTC).

CAVINEE, EMILY M V SYLVESTRI, GREGORY JAMES

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 CAVINEE, EMILY M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SYLVESTRI, GREGORY JAMES. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEEVER-AGRAMA , DINA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEEVER-AGRAMA , DINA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CAVINEE , EMILY M

Defendant and Respondent

SYLVESTRI , GREGORY JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes: DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketATTY. FOR PETITIONER: MONTGOMERY, THOMAS; Notes: ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: MONTGOMERY, THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUD DISSOLVING MARRIAGE BOOK 34331 PAGE 945-945; Notes: DTD 05-23-23 KEEVER AGRAMA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING 05/23/2023 09:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO PETITION, WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE AND MANDATORY FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE F/B RESP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Notes: F/B RESP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketAGREEMENT; Notes: (MARITAL SETTLEMENT) F/B PET **SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4874404; Receipt Amount: $409.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $409.00; total Amount Paid: $409.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/26/2023; Description: 700FF Family Dissolution of Marriage PB_070117PB; Amount Due: $409.00; Amount Paid: $409.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketPAID $409.00 ON RECEIPT 4874404; Notes: $409.00 4874404 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: FH: Family North County - FH (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Notes: F/B PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketPETITION; Notes: FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE F/B PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less