This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/31/2023 at 22:41:33 (UTC).

MANZANET LOPEZ, YUNESKY V CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/21/2023 MANZANET LOPEZ, YUNESKY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MANZANET LOPEZ , YUNESKY

Defendant and Respondent

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CANAURA , JOSE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/21/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/21/2023:COMPLAINT

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

06/21/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/21/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/21/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/21/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4948410

06/27/2023:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4948410

NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

06/29/2023:NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/29/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/18/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/18/2023:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/19/2023:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: F/B DFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: OF E-MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 F/B ATTY GALO OBO DFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION 6/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes: & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B ATTY JOSE M. CANAURA, ESQ. OBO PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4948410; Receipt Amount: $411.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

FinancialDue Date: 06/27/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS - County Civil - CC - SC; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

FinancialDue Date: 06/27/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4948410; Notes: $411.00 4948410 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@davidlowpa.com;david@davidlowpa.com;dkallin@davidlowpa.com CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION E FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRAT SET F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less