This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/21/2023 at 18:06:03 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION V DURAN, JONATHAN A

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DURAN, JONATHAN A. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Defendant and Respondent

DURAN , JONATHAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOFFMAN , JESSICA R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/18/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/18/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4904307

05/19/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4904307

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 4C (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4904307; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MAIL@ROLFLELAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/13/2023 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/13/2023 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4904307; Notes: $185.00 4904307 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less