This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/24/2023 at 19:02:37 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC V SANTOYO, LETTICIA

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANTOYO, LETTICIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC

Defendant and Respondent

SANTOYO , LETTICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KOWAL , BRIAN P

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/15/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

05/15/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4899047

05/16/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4899047

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/17/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4903286

05/19/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4903286

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/22/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/24/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/06/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

06/06/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

06/07/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT

06/12/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

06/13/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34373 PAGE 718-718; Notes: FOR POSSESSION AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO "CLOSE" THE FILE - SIGNED JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 6/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT LETTICA SANTOYO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: MOTION FOR DEFAULT LETTICIA SANTOYO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LETTICA SANTOYO - 05/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4903286; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4903286; Notes: $10.00 4903286 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: bpkowal@gmail.com;filings.briankowal@gmail.com LETTICA SANTOYA EMAILED TO PLTS ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4899047; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/16/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4899047; Notes: $185.00 4899047 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less