This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/10/2023 at 19:02:56 (UTC).

JOSIAH'S FUTURE INVESTMENTS, LLC V VERILUS, DUCKEN

Case Summary

On 03/31/2023 JOSIAH'S FUTURE INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VERILUS, DUCKEN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOSIAH'S FUTURE INVESTMENTS, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

VERILUS , DUCKEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/31/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

03/31/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4844847

04/03/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4844847

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/05/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/10/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DUCKEN VERILUS - 04/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4844847; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/03/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/03/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4844847; Notes: $195.00 4844847 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less