This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/01/2023 at 01:18:45 (UTC).

DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER INC (ASSIGNEE OF LORMISTOIS, ANTOINE) V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER INC ASSIGNEE OF LORMISTOIS, ANTOINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER INC (ASSIGNEE OF LORMISTOIS, ANTOINE)

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KAY , REBECCA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/21/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/21/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/21/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/21/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/21/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/21/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4872133

04/24/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4872133

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

DEMAND FOR:

05/02/2023:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/02/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/02/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF HEARING - CIVIL

06/01/2023:NOTICE OF HEARING - CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/12/2023:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

HEARING DISPOSITION SHEET

06/13/2023:HEARING DISPOSITION SHEET

ANSWER

06/20/2023:ANSWER

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/23/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/23/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: FB DFT- TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - CIVIL; Notes: RK-KD@KUBICKIDRAPER.COM; SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 6/29/2023 10:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 6/29/2023 10:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: SB; Room: #6 (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B REBECCA KAY OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM E-SERVICE TO PLT'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 5/31/2023 9:00 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 5/31/2023 9:00 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4872133; Notes: $310.00 4872133 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less