This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/01/2023 at 01:06:38 (UTC).

QUALITY SPINE CENTER, INC. V GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 QUALITY SPINE CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

QUALITY SPINE CENTER, INC.

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KNOPF , ALLEGRA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/18/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/18/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4904135

05/19/2023:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4904135

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/01/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/20/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR ENLRGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT (F/B DFT)

06/20/2023:MOTION FOR ENLRGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT (F/B DFT)

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

06/28/2023:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE; Notes: JUDGE CORLEW ON 6/28/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLRGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT (F/B DFT); Notes: FOR ENLRGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT (F/B DFT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: DESIGNATED ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS; F/B ALLEGRA KNOPF OF VERNIS & BOWLING OF PALM BEACH AS ATTY FOR DFT GEICO INDEMNITY CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - 05/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4904135; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/19/2023; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 6/29/2023 10:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 6/29/2023 10:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4904135; Notes: $90.00 4904135 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less