This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/05/2023 at 18:59:38 (UTC).

KOVACS, ANNAMARIA V PASQUALINO, MICHAEL F

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 KOVACS, ANNAMARIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PASQUALINO, MICHAEL F. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

KOVACS , ANNAMARIA

KOVACS , PETER

Defendant and Respondent

PASQUALINO , MICHAEL F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/26/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

05/26/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/26/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4915829

05/31/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4915829

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/02/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/05/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

06/13/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

06/13/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/13/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

06/21/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34398 PAGE 383-383

06/26/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34398 PAGE 383-383

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34398 PAGE 383-383; Notes: AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION -JUDGE TEW DTD 6/26/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM MICHAEL F PASQUALINO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: CLERKS AS TO MICHAEL F PASQUALINO F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AS TO MICHAEL F PASQUALINO F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED MICHAEL F. PASQUALINO - 06/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4915829; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/31/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4915829; Notes: $195.00 4915829 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less