This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/23/2023 at 18:59:06 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC V CHAPPELL, ALICIA

Case Summary

On 05/14/2023 SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHAPPELL, ALICIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC

Defendant and Respondent

CHAPPELL , ALICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KOWAL , BRIAN P

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/14/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

05/14/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4898696

05/16/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4898696

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/16/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4901610

05/17/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4901610

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/19/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER

05/22/2023:ANSWER

PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4905975

05/22/2023:PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4905975

ORDER SETTING HEARING

05/22/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

PAID $1,124.00 ON RECEIPT 4913432

05/26/2023:PAID $1,124.00 ON RECEIPT 4913432

PAID $386.25 ON RECEIPT 4916442

05/31/2023:PAID $386.25 ON RECEIPT 4916442

PAID $530.00 ON RECEIPT 4932886

06/13/2023:PAID $530.00 ON RECEIPT 4932886

MEDIATION REPORT

06/13/2023:MEDIATION REPORT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34376 PAGE 319-319

06/14/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34376 PAGE 319-319

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketCHECK ISSUED; Notes: Court Registry(Led_ID: 620425 Case#: ) Check #: 00117996 for $2490 was disbursed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4934040; Receipt Amount: $2,490.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $5,240.25; total Amount Paid: $5,240.25; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/14/2023; Description: Registry disbursement; Amount Due: $2,490.00; Amount Paid: $2,490.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes: DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes: 4934040 $2,490.00 SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34376 PAGE 319-319; Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PAYMENT WITH FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AND/OR DAMAGES UPON DEFAULT, ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT OF ANY REGISTRY DEPOSITS AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE THE FILE JUDGE SARA ALIJEWICZ SIGNED ON 06/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4932886; Receipt Amount: $530.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/13/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $15.00; Amount Paid: $15.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/13/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $515.00; Amount Paid: $515.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4901610; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/17/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4901610; Notes: $10.00 4901610 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4898696; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/16/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: bpkowal@gmail.com;filings.briankowal@gmail.com E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4898696; Notes: $185.00 4898696 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less