This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/09/2023 at 19:12:14 (UTC).

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC V POLYNICE, SCHELLA I

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against POLYNICE, SCHELLA I. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SAPPHIRE BELLE LLC

Defendant and Respondent

POLYNICE , SCHELLA I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KOWAL , BRIAN P

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

05/30/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4916490

05/31/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4916490

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4917596

06/01/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4917596

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/04/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4917596; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/01/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4917596; Notes: $10.00 4917596 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4916490; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/31/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: bpkowal@gmail.com;filings.briankowal@gmail.com EMAILED TO PLTS ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4916490; Notes: $185.00 4916490 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less