This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/05/2023 at 19:02:09 (UTC).

JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC V HOLLAND, MALCOLM

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOLLAND, MALCOLM. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JOSIAHS FUTURE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

BURDEN , TAQUOIA

HOLLAND , MALCOLM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/26/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/26/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/26/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/26/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4914490

05/30/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4914490

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/01/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/01/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/01/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/06/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED TAQUOIA BURDEN - 06/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4914490; Receipt Amount: $205.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

FinancialDue Date: 05/30/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

FinancialDue Date: 05/30/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

FinancialDue Date: 05/30/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4914490; Notes: $205.00 4914490 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MNICHOLS1985@BELLSOUTH.NET E-ISSUED TO ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MNICHOLS1985@BELLSOUTH.NET E-ISSUED TO ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less