This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/17/2023 at 19:02:09 (UTC).

ALSTON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC V BENJAMIN, DOMINIQUE

Case Summary

On 08/08/2023 ALSTON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BENJAMIN, DOMINIQUE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALSTON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant and Respondent

BENJAMIN , DOMINIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONTGOMERY , THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/08/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

08/08/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/08/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4999168

08/08/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4999168

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/10/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/14/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER

08/16/2023:ANSWER

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/16/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/16/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

08/18/2023:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY -$2180 BY 4PM ON 8/28/23- JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/22/23

08/22/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY -$2180 BY 4PM ON 8/28/23- JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/22/23

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34549 PAGE 1539-1539

09/08/2023:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34549 PAGE 1539-1539

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

09/11/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34549 PAGE 1539-1539; Notes: FOR POSSESSION - SIGNED JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 9/8/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY -$2180 BY 4PM ON 8/28/23- JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/22/23; Notes: DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY -$2180 BY 4PM ON 8/28/23- JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/22/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT DOMINIQUE BENJAMN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE DOMINIQUE BENJAMIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DOMINIQUE BENJAMIN - 08/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4999168; Receipt Amount: $195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialDue Date: 08/08/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS - County Civil - CC - SC; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialDue Date: 08/08/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4999168; Notes: $195.00 4999168 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mnichols1985@bellsouth.net;thomlaw1948@aol.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less