This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/12/2023 at 19:00:32 (UTC).

GREEN TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. V GONZALEZ, ANACELY

Case Summary

On 07/03/2023 GREEN TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ, ANACELY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GREEN TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

Respondents and Defendants

ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

GONZALEZ , ANACELY

UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WILDER , LEONARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/03/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/03/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4960449

07/07/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4960449

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/07/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/07/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4962413

07/09/2023:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4962413

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/11/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/11/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/26/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/26/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/26/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

07/27/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/31/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

07/31/2023:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes: OF ORDER SPECIAL SETTING HEARING WAS MAILED TO DFTS . FB PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: ORDER SPECIALLY SETTING REMOTE HEARING ON 8/15/23 AT 1:30 PM. DATED 7/30/23 S. TEW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: AND JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND POSSESSION. FB PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED UNKNOWN TENANT - 07/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED ANACELY GONZALEZ - 07/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED ANACELY GONZALEZ - 07/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4962413; Receipt Amount: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/09/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/09/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB 70123 ***; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4962413; Notes: $20.00 4962413 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4960449; Receipt Amount: $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/07/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: lwilder@ssclawfirm.com;smurguia@ssclawfirm.com EMAILED TO PLTS ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: lwilder@ssclawfirm.com;smurguia@ssclawfirm.com EMAILED TO PLTS ATTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4960449; Notes: $185.00 4960449 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less