This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/02/2023 at 01:12:24 (UTC).

CLEMENT, JEFFREY V COMBAT CLUB BOCA LLC

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 CLEMENT, JEFFREY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COMBAT CLUB BOCA LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CLEMENT , JEFFREY

Defendant and Respondent

COMBAT CLUB BOCA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CLEMENT , ASHLEY-ANN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/21/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/21/2023:COMPLAINT

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4873016

04/25/2023:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4873016

SUMMONS REQUESTED

04/27/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4878994

04/28/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4878994

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/28/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

05/31/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PARTIES NO APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4878994; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/28/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: INFO@PALMERSLAW.NET E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4878994; Notes: $10.00 4878994 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4873016; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/25/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 5/31/2023 1:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 5/31/2023 1:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4873016; Notes: $300.00 4873016 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less