This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/28/2023 at 01:34:19 (UTC).

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA V DUCASSE, JIMMY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DUCASSE, JIMMY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA

Defendant and Respondent

DUCASSE , JIMMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ESTEVEZ , KEILA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/24/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/24/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/24/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4910621

05/25/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4910621

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/25/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6K (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4910621; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/25/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/25/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SOUTHFLALITIGATION@ZWICKERPC.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/27/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/27/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4910621; Notes: $310.00 4910621 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less