This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/27/2023 at 19:01:56 (UTC).

GREEN TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC V HENNE, SAVANNAH

Case Summary

On 07/18/2023 GREEN TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HENNE, SAVANNAH. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GREEN TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

HENNE , SAVANNAH

UNKNOWN TENANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WILDER , LEONARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/18/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/18/2023:COMPLAINT

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4975488

07/19/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4975488

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/19/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4976101

07/19/2023:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4976101

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/25/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/25/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/02/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/02/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

08/03/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER SETTING HEARING

08/07/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/08/2023:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes: FB PLT- OF ORDER SPECIAL SETTING HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: SPECIALLY 8/31/2023 AT 11:30 A.M. MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - SIGNED JUDGE TEW 8/7/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AND POSSESSION F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED UNKNOWN TENANT - 07/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED SAVANNAH HENNE - 07/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4976101; Receipt Amount: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 4975488; Receipt Amount: $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/19/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB 70123 ***; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/19/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB 70123 ***; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

FinancialDue Date: 07/19/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4976101; Notes: $20.00 4976101 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: lwilder@ssclawfirm.com;smurguia@ssclawfirm.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: lwilder@ssclawfirm.com;smurguia@ssclawfirm.com AS TO SAVANNAH HENNE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4975488; Notes: $185.00 4975488 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less