This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/14/2019 at 17:32:31 (UTC).

CARTER, JULIE M

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 CARTER, JULIE M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

CARTER , STEPHEN E

CARTER , COCOA AE

Decedent

CARTER , JULIE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

KORN , ROBERT E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 30413 PAGE 1998-1998; Notes:S/B JDG S. SCHOSBERG FEUER DTD 02/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:OF NON-RESIDENT & APPT. STEPHEN E. CARTER & COCOA AE CARTER AS CO-P.R.'S S/B JDG S. SCHOSBERG FEUER DTD 02/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • PAID $3.00 ON RECEIPT 3033655; Notes:$3.00 3033655 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • CERTIFICATE; Notes:(SECOND) APPOINTMENT OF ANCILLARY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES F/B STEPHEN CARTER & COCOA CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • EXPARTE CLERKS MEMO; Notes:JUDGE SCHOSBERG FEUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • INVENTORY - ESTATE; Notes:F/B STEPHEN E. CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • WAIVER; Notes:OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION AND CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF ANCILLARY P/R F/B STEPHEN E. CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • CERTIFICATE; Notes:RE: APPOINTMENT OF ANCILLARY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES F/B STEPHEN E. CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF P/R, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B COCOA A.E. CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF P/R, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B STEPHEN E. CARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • PAID $232.00 ON RECEIPT 2993664; Notes:$232.00 2993664 Balance Due: $169.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IZ: South Branch Probate - IZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B STEPHEN E. CARTER NAD COCOA A.E. CARTER E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Receipt Number:3033655; Receipt Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Receipt Number:3007891; Receipt Amount: $169.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Receipt Number:2993664; Receipt Amount: $232.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$404.00; total Amount Paid:$404.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Due Date:02/12/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$3.00; Amount Paid:$3.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Due Date:01/11/2019; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less