This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/05/2023 at 19:46:53 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC V DOHERTY, RYAN C

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DOHERTY, RYAN C. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOHERTY , ANGELA K

DOHERTY , RYAN C

HFH CAPITAL LLC

RICCI , CORRINE

RICCI , MICHAEL

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANGELA K DOHERTY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RYAN C DOHERTY

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KISER , AMY M

 

Court Documents

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

02/02/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

02/01/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDING

01/06/2023:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDING

01/06/2023:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDING

01/06/2023:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDING

01/06/2023:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE/ PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE

01/06/2023:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE/ PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/06/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COMPLAINT

01/06/2023:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS BOOK 34061 PAGE 1247-1247

01/06/2023:LIS PENDENS BOOK 34061 PAGE 1247-1247

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/06/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net AS TO DFT SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net AS TO DFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net AS TO DFT HFH CAPITAL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net AS TO DFT UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net AS TO DFT UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net AS TO DFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANGELA K DOHERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net AS TO DFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RYAN C DOHERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net AS TO DFT ANGELA K DOHERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM); Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM); Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM); Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM); Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM); Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE 3 LANGUAGE VERSION / PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE/ PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM); Notes: emailservice@gilbertgrouplaw.com;360efile@360legal.net PLEASE ATTACH ADA-NOTICE/ PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.207, ALL SUMMONSES, COMMUNICATIONS NOTICING COURT PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GENERAL MASTERS, AND MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS SHALL INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE ADA-NOTICE.PDF (15THCIRCUIT.COM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34061 PAGE 1247-1247; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less