Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/16/2021 at 19:53:11 (UTC).

CARACATSANIS, DANIEL V LOLAND, RUSSEL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 CARACATSANIS, DANIEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOLAND, RUSSEL. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CARACATSANIS , DANIEL

Defendants and Respondents

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

LOLAND , RUSSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCHWENCKE , MATTHEW K

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CHARBONNET , LEAH F

SORENSON , STEVEN K

BALDUCCI , MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/16/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/12/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/12/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/12/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/12/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/12/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD. 3/11/21 MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART PLTFS BAD FAITH COUNT IS ABATED.

03/12/2021:AGREED ORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD. 3/11/21 MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART PLTFS BAD FAITH COUNT IS ABATED.

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/10/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/10/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/09/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/09/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/09/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/09/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/09/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO THE DEFENDANT, RUSSEL LOLAND'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO LT (F/B DFT RUSSELL LOLAND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO PLT (F/B DFT RUSSELL LOLAND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO PLT DANIEL CARACATSANIS (F/B RUSSELL LOLAND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:DANIEL CARACATSANIS 6/15/2021 @ 10:30 (F/B DFT RUSSELL LOLAND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B DFT RUSSELL LOLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD. 3/11/21 MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART PLTFS BAD FAITH COUNT IS ABATED.; Notes:J KASTRENAKES DTD. 3/11/21 MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART PLTFS BAD FAITH COUNT IS ABATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:schwencketeam@searcylaw.com;mks@searcylaw.com;kloucks@searcylaw.com AS TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, RUSSEL LOLAND F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT, RUSSEL LOLAND F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:schwencketeam@searcylaw.com;mks@searcylaw.com;kloucks@searcylaw.com AS TO RUSSEL LOLAND EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:schwencketeam@searcylaw.com;mks@searcylaw.com;kloucks@searcylaw.com AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Balducci

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SORENSON , STEVEN K