This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/02/2023 at 15:07:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. V OBERSTEIN, EDWARD L

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed an Other lawsuit against OBERSTEIN, EDWARD L. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

OBERSTEIN , EDWARD L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PUENTE , SARAH R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/02/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

03/02/2023:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

03/02/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS IS NOT UPLOADED. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT. THANK YOU

03/02/2023:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS IS NOT UPLOADED. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT. THANK YOU

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4802526

03/06/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4802526

COMPLAINT

03/02/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/10/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/27/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE EDWARD L OBERSTEIN - 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: rd@ecert.comcastbiz.net

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4802526; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/06/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4802526; Notes: $310.00 4802526 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS IS NOT UPLOADED. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT. THANK YOU; Notes: rd@ecert.comcastbiz.net SUMMONS IS NOT UPLOADED. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT. THANK YOU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less