This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/11/2023 at 15:13:02 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. V KLEINFELDT, PAUL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KLEINFELDT, PAUL. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

KLEINFELDT , PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PUENTE , SARAH R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

01/30/2023:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4762529

01/31/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4762529

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/30/2023:COMPLAINT

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

02/24/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

03/01/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT'S ATTY PRESENT DFT NO APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE PAUL KLEINFELDT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: RD@ECERT.COMCASTBIZ.NET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4762529; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 3/1/2023 2:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 3/1/2023 2:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4762529; Notes: $310.00 4762529 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less