This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/08/2023 at 19:48:12 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. V KATZ, DENISE

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KATZ, DENISE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

KATZ , DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PUENTE , SARAH R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/09/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/09/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/09/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4809472

03/10/2023:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4809472

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

03/09/2023:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/27/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DENISE KATZ - 03/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4809472; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/10/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/10/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4809472; Notes: $411.00 4809472 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: rd@ecert.comcastbiz.net AS TO DENISE KATZ EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: BREACH OF CONTRACT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less