This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/23/2023 at 15:59:13 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. V WUNDERS, AMANDA V

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WUNDERS, AMANDA V. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

WUNDERS , AMANDA V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CLINE , RYAN T

 

Court Documents

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4814338

03/14/2023:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4814338

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RECEIPT FOR FILE

03/13/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RECEIPT FOR FILE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

03/13/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE AND MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

03/13/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE AND MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING

03/13/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMO OF DISPOSITION

03/13/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMO OF DISPOSITION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF NON SERVICE

03/13/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF NON SERVICE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS ISSUANCE

03/13/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS ISSUANCE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

03/13/2023:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6K (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING SERVICE; Notes: JUDGE GARRISON DTD 4/11/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUANCE; Notes: OF PRETRIAL - 4/11/23 IS CANCELLED- JUDGE GARRISON DTD 4/11/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes: RD@ECERT.COMCASTBIZ.NET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE; Notes: RD@ECERT.COMCASTBIZ.NET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4814338; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $300.00; total Amount Paid: $300.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/14/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4814338; Notes: $300.00 4814338 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 4/11/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 4/11/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION; Notes: ORDER GRANTING PLTF MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE AND MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION; Notes: PLTF NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE AND MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING; Notes: ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION AND ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMO OF DISPOSITION; Notes: MEMO OF DISPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT RETURN OF NON SERVICE; Notes: RETURN OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS ISSUANCE; Notes: SUMMONS ISSUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING; Notes: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT; Notes: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO PALM BEACH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less