This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/17/2022 at 15:22:18 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. V MENDEZ, MIGDALYS

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MENDEZ, MIGDALYS. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

MENDEZ , MIGDALYS

Miami, FL 33175-7051

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SPINOZZA , KEVIN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

06/08/2022:NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4493709

06/08/2022:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4493709

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO DISMISS

06/07/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO DISMISS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

06/07/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DISTRICT COURT

06/07/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DISTRICT COURT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

06/07/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

06/08/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMO OF DISPOSITION

06/07/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMO OF DISPOSITION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE

06/07/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PARTIES NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4493709; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE; Notes: LEGALPLEADINGS@POLLACKROSEN.COM E-ISSUED TO PLT ATTY; MAILED TO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes: LEGALPLEADINGS@POLLACKROSEN.COM E-ISSUED TO PLT ATTY; MAILED TO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4493709; Notes: $300.00 4493709 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/7/2022 2:00 PM BURKE, LAUREN; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/7/2022 2:00 PM BURKE, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $300.00; total Amount Paid: $300.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/07/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes: CASE SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DISTRICT COURT; Notes: ALIAS SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMO OF DISPOSITION; Notes: MEMO OF DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE; Notes: NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE; Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DISTRICT COURT; Notes: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT; Notes: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF DESIGNAION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Notes: NOTICE OF DESIGNAION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin