This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/01/2021 at 19:11:13 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. V FRANZOSE, SUZANNE M

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANZOSE, SUZANNE M. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

FRANZOSE , SUZANNE M

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418-8149

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FLEISCHER , REBECCA

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WELLS , MARILYN G

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/15/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/11/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

05/27/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

COMPLAINT

05/27/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4045047

05/28/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4045047

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/27/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/27/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:4C (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:& NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES & DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE F/B MARILYN G WELLS OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUZANNE M FRANZOSE - 06/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4045047; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:05/28/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:05/28/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:FLORIDA@COOLINGWINTER.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/13/2021 10:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/13/2021 10:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4045047; Notes:$310.00 4045047 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REBECA FLEISCHER