This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/29/2022 at 11:27:54 (UTC).

CAPITAL ABSTRACT AND TITLE OF CORAL SPRINGS INC V KRESER, PEARL P

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 CAPITAL ABSTRACT AND TITLE OF CORAL SPRINGS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KRESER, PEARL P. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

CAPITAL ABSTRACT AND TITLE OF CORAL SPRINGS INC

BERGER REALTY

KRESSER , PEARL P

Defendants and Respondents

BERGER REALTY GROUP INC

CHARLES RUTENBERG REALTY FORT LAUDERDALE

KRESER , PEARL P

SELEZNYOVA , IRINA

SELEZNYOVA , IRENA

Cross Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BERGER REALTY

KRESSER , PEARL P

Cross Defendant and Respondent

SELEZNYOVA , IRENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

VINES , MICHAEL R

Defendant, Respondent, Petitioner and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MITTELBERG , BARRY S

VINES , MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER S KERNER DTD 9/12/2022 ON DFTS BERGER REALTY GROUP INC AND PEARL P KRESSER MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR TO ANSWER TO THE INTERROGATORIES - GRANTED. DFTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/18/2022 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED

09/12/2022:AGREED ORDER S KERNER DTD 9/12/2022 ON DFTS BERGER REALTY GROUP INC AND PEARL P KRESSER MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR TO ANSWER TO THE INTERROGATORIES - GRANTED. DFTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/18/2022 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY IRENA SELEZNOVA

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

09/08/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/07/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/22/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/22/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/19/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/19/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4559340

08/02/2022:PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4559340

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COUNTERCLAIM

07/27/2022:COUNTERCLAIM

PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4552079

07/27/2022:PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4552079

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/25/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER GRANTING S. KERNER DTD 07/19/22. (AGREED) DFTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. THE DFT'S MOTION IS HEREBY GRANTED. DFTS PEARL P. KRESSER AS TRUSTEE OF THE PEARL PETA KRESSER TRUST DATED 07/24/14 AND BERGER REALTY GROUP, INC SHALL FILE AND SERVE

07/19/2022:ORDER GRANTING S. KERNER DTD 07/19/22. (AGREED) DFTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. THE DFT'S MOTION IS HEREBY GRANTED. DFTS PEARL P. KRESSER AS TRUSTEE OF THE PEARL PETA KRESSER TRUST DATED 07/24/14 AND BERGER REALTY GROUP, INC SHALL FILE AND SERVE A RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN 15 DAYS OF THIS ORDER.

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

07/15/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/15/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER

06/17/2022:ANSWER

PAID $441.00 ON RECEIPT 4504081

06/16/2022:PAID $441.00 ON RECEIPT 4504081

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER S KERNER DTD 9/12/2022 ON DFTS BERGER REALTY GROUP INC AND PEARL P KRESSER MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR TO ANSWER TO THE INTERROGATORIES - GRANTED. DFTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/18/2022 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY IRENA SELEZNOVA; Notes: S KERNER DTD 9/12/2022 ON DFTS BERGER REALTY GROUP INC AND PEARL P KRESSER MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR TO ANSWER TO THE INTERROGATORIES - GRANTED. DFTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 10/18/2022 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY IRENA SELEZNOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: TO CROSS CLAIM - F/B DFT'S BERGER REALTY GROUP INC AND PEARL P KRESSER AS TRUSTEE OF THE PEARL PETA KRESSER TRUST DATED JULY 24, 2014 `

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: DEFENDANT PEARL P, KRESSER AS TRUSTEE, OF THE PEARL PETA KRESSER TRUST DATED JULY 24, 2014 ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S IRENA SELEZNYOVA REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: DEFENDANT BERGER REALTY GROUP, INC., ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S IRENA SELEZNYOVA REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4559340; Receipt Amount: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,231.00; total Amount Paid: $1,231.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/02/2022; Description: 8CTP CA General Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due: $395.00; Amount Paid: $395.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/16/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $441.00 ON RECEIPT 4504081; Notes: $441.00 4504081 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mvinespleadings@att.net ISSUED TO PEARL P KRESER EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mvinespleadings@att.net ISSUED TO BERGER REALTY GROUP INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mvinespleadings@att.net ISSUED TO IRINA SELENZYOVA EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mvinespleadings@att.net ISSUED TO CHARLES RUTENBERG REALTY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: TO INTERPLEAD EARNEST MONEY DEPOSIT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ABSTRACT AND TITLE OF CORAL SPRINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BERGER REALTY GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mittelberg, Barry S, ESQ.