This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 14:00:10 (UTC).

CAMPANELLI, KEVIN V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 CAMPANELLI, KEVIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CAMPANELLI , KEVIN

CAMPANELLI , MARIA

Respondent and Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BIRS , BRITTANY

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

DEMAHY , DANIELLE

EIKNER , CLAUDIA R

REEVES , ALECIA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

01/11/2023:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/10/2023:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

12/28/2022:EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED

DISCLOSURE

12/28/2022:DISCLOSURE

WITNESS LIST

12/28/2022:WITNESS LIST

WITNESS LIST

12/28/2022:WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/02/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/02/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

10/19/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/17/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

10/06/2022:DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/29/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/18/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

07/14/2022:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/13/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/13/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/13/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

07/07/2022:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 06/15/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes: DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S EXHIBIT LIST, IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S UNIFORM TRIAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE; Notes: DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Notes: DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, WITNESS LIST IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S UNIFORM TRIAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S FACT AND EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES AND EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS' SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM 10/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO DEFT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS, F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/06/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/06/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4454821; Notes: $411.00 4454821 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: bbirs@itsaboutjustice.law;christelle@itsaboutjustice.law;khadesha@itsaboutjustice.law ISSUED TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less