This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/20/2021 at 23:49:17 (UTC).

CAMELOT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC V ROSARIO, ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 CAMELOT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against ROSARIO, ANTONIO. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CAMELOT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC

801 S FEDERAL LLC

Defendants and Respondents

ROSARIO , ANTONIO

ROSARIO , DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WORMAN , ROBERT M

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED

11/02/2020:SERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

07/31/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31616 PAGE 857-858

07/27/2020:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31616 PAGE 857-858

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/22/2020:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

07/22/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

MOTION TO STRIKE

07/22/2020:MOTION TO STRIKE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/22/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/22/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

REPLY/RESPONSE

07/16/2020:REPLY/RESPONSE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/13/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/13/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/08/2020:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/09/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/09/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3676993

07/09/2020:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3676993

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/08/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED NOT EXECUTED; Notes:ANTONIO ROSARIO DAWN ROSARIO 10/2/20 UNEXECUTED 10/28/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes:FORWARD TO PBSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31616 PAGE 857-858; Notes:JUDGE GILLMAN ON 7/27/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:ANTONIO ROSARIO F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT; Notes:OF RENT (HOLDOVER EVICTION) F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes:AND FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGENT FOR EVICTION/POSSESSION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AS TO DAWN ROSARIO 7/11/2020 SUBSTITUTE ANTONIO ROSARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AS TO ANTONIO ROSARIO 7/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:F/B DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3676993; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$205.00; total Amount Paid:$205.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/09/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/09/2020; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ROBWESQ@COMCAST.NET DFT DAWN E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ROBWESQ@COMCAST.NET DFT ANTONIO E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3676993; Notes:$205.00 3676993 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services is a litigant