Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/07/2021 at 18:51:39 (UTC).

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC V KEY KEY MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KEY KEY MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS LLC

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

CYPRESS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY

KEY KEY MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SEYMOUR , ELAINE C

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ZIGELSKY , ANDREA R

SCHWARTZ , STEVEN G

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION

12/11/2020:OBJECTION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

12/04/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/05/2020:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

11/02/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

10/28/2020:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/26/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/26/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO

10/22/2020:AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO

MOTION TO COMPEL

10/12/2020:MOTION TO COMPEL

COMPLAINT

10/06/2020:COMPLAINT

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

10/02/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

AGREED ORDER J GOODMAN DTD 09/29/2020 DFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS COMPLAINT - GRANTED. PLTFS SHALL HAVE LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE ITS 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT W/IN 30 DAYS OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. DFTS WILL FILE AND SERVE ANY RESPONSIVE PLEADING W/IN 20 DAYS OF SERVICE OF THE PLTFS 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES.

09/29/2020:AGREED ORDER J GOODMAN DTD 09/29/2020 DFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS COMPLAINT - GRANTED. PLTFS SHALL HAVE LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE ITS 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT W/IN 30 DAYS OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. DFTS WILL FILE AND SERVE ANY RESPONSIVE PLEADING W/IN 20 DAYS OF SERVICE OF THE PLTFS 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES.

MOTION TO DISMISS

09/04/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/02/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

07/30/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/13/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3656784

06/19/2020:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3656784

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3636821

05/27/2020:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3636821

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT; Notes:MEDIATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Notes:DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:PLAINTIFFS BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA, LLC, BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION AND DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEM, LLC'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes:AMDENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION CHANGE OF DATE 12/22/2020 01:00:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO; Notes:PLAINTIFF DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS, LLC'S SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING FLA.R.CIV.P. 1.31(B)(6) DEPOSITION OF CLEVELAND SMITH, THE CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF KEY KEY MAINTENANCE SERVICES, INC. CLEVELAND SMITH 11/11/2020 10:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT KEY KEY MAINTENANCE SERVICES, INC.'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT CYPRESS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes:NOTICE OF MEDIATION 12/08/2020 01:00:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:DEFENDANT CYPRESS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CYPRESS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DEFENDANTCYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY BY AND THROUGH UNDERSIGNE; Notes:CYPRESS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DEFENDANTCYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY BY AND THROUGH UNDERSIGNE

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:06/19/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 3656784; Notes:$20.00 3656784 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:info@rclawllp.com;ecs@rclawllp.com;smk@rclawllp.com AS TO DFT KEY KEY MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:info@rclawllp.com;ecs@rclawllp.com;smk@rclawllp.com AS TO DFT CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3636821; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:05/27/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3636821; Notes:$401.00 3636821 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY LLC BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION AND DIVERSIFIED MAINTENANCE SYSTEMS LLC'S COMPLAINT AGAINST KEY KEY MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC AND CYPRESS PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Diversified Maintenance Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY WAREHOUSE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant