This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/08/2019 at 17:36:03 (UTC).

BURKE, JOHN F JR

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 BURKE, JOHN F JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BURKE , MARION L

Decedent

BURKE JR, JOHN F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SUAREZ-RITA , STELLA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • ORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 30442 PAGE 1301-1302; Notes:SIGNED JUDGE MAXINE CHEESMAN 02-21-19 CC'S OF ALL ORDS MLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD BOOK 30442 PAGE 1308-1309; Notes:SIGNED JUDGE MAXINE CHEESMAN 02-21-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:SIGNED JUDGE MAXINE CHEESMAN 02-21-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SUAREZRITA, STELLA; Notes:REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SUAREZRITA, STELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • PETITIONER: BURKE, MARION L; Notes:Petitioner: BURKE, MARION L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • PAID $11.00 ON RECEIPT 3033230; Notes:$11.00 3033230 Fully Paid 3 CC'S MLD 02-27-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • WILL BOOK 30442 PAGE 1263-1268; Notes:ORIGINAL - DTD 4/30/01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • PAID $346.00 ON RECEIPT 3022299; Notes:$346.00 3022299 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • FUNERAL BILL; Notes:F/B ATTY SUAREZ-RITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B ATTY SUAREZ-RITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • PETITION DETERMINING HOMESTEAD; Notes:F/B ATTY SUAREZ-RITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes:F/B ATTY SUAREZ-RITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Receipt Number:3033230; Receipt Amount: $11.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Receipt Number:3022299; Receipt Amount: $346.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$357.00; total Amount Paid:$357.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Due Date:02/11/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$11.00; Amount Paid:$11.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Due Date:02/04/2019; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less