This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/25/2022 at 06:10:26 (UTC).

BRUXELAS, BRUNO V HSR CONSTRUCTORS

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 BRUXELAS, BRUNO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HSR CONSTRUCTORS. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BRUXELAS , BRUNO

Defendant and Respondent

HSR CONSTRUCTORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

VIVO , JEFFREY A

HERMAN JR, MICHAEL S

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEACH , ERIC L

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/24/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

01/20/2022:ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

01/14/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES

11/09/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

11/05/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

09/29/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

09/29/2021:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

09/29/2021:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

09/29/2021:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/19/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/16/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/16/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/10/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

COMPLAINT

08/10/2021:COMPLAINT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/28/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4109984

07/20/2021:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4109984

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2021:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

07/14/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY BRITTO OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes:NUTT: THIS MATTER IS AT ISSUE AND WILL BE SET FOR TRIAL BY SEPARATE ORDER DTD 1-20-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT, HSR CONSTRUCTORS' RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:DEFENDANT, HSR CONSTRUCTORS' NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT HSR CONTRSUCTORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT HSR CONSTRUCTORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4089168; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/02/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/02/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4089168; Notes:$411.00 4089168 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jeffrey@vivolawyer.com;sabrina.almaraz@vivolawyer.com TO BE SERVED ON HSR CONSTRUCTORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BRUNO BRUZELAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less