This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 01:21:01 (UTC).

BRIXNER, TAMARA V JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 BRIXNER, TAMARA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL , LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMALL , LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BRIXNER , TAMARA

Defendants and Respondents

RASTATTER MD, CHADWICK

GOAD MD, JAMES

ENVISION HEALTHCARE CORP

BELTRAN , JARYNET ARNP

ATLANTIC SAURY INPATIENT SERVICES, LLC

EMERGENCY PHYSICIAN SOLUTIONS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC

KATZ DO , AVIV

UNIVERSITY OF MIAMI

PALM BEACH GENERAL SURGERY LLC

JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PHAN , HAI MD

LINETT DO , MICHAEL

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KEEN ESQ, DARLA L

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

RITUCCI , AMANDA

ROMAGUERA , RAUL

CITRON , HOWARD L

CABANAS , OSCAR J

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT STEVEN BECKER MD WILL BE AVAO;AB;E NOVEMBER 1, 6. 8, 13 AND 15, 2019 F/B PLTS ATTY

08/15/2019:NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT STEVEN BECKER MD WILL BE AVAO;AB;E NOVEMBER 1, 6. 8, 13 AND 15, 2019 F/B PLTS ATTY

NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT CRAIG LICHTBLAU MD WILL BE AVAILABLE SEPTEMBER 23 AND 24, 2019 @ 5:00 PM, OCTOBER 2, 10, 15, 23 AND 24, 2019 @ 4:00 PM AND DECEMBER 18 AND 19, 2019 @ 4:00 PM F/B PTLS ATTY

08/15/2019:NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT CRAIG LICHTBLAU MD WILL BE AVAILABLE SEPTEMBER 23 AND 24, 2019 @ 5:00 PM, OCTOBER 2, 10, 15, 23 AND 24, 2019 @ 4:00 PM AND DECEMBER 18 AND 19, 2019 @ 4:00 PM F/B PTLS ATTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/06/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/24/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

06/17/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/29/2019:RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/06/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/29/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

AGREED ORDER L SMALL DTD 3/27/19 MOTION TO AMEND COMPAINT IS GRANTED.

03/27/2019:AGREED ORDER L SMALL DTD 3/27/19 MOTION TO AMEND COMPAINT IS GRANTED.

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

01/25/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/24/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/24/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/11/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/10/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

11/20/2018:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/20/2018:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT

11/20/2018:COMPLAINT

173 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER SMALL DTD 8/19/19: PLT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF TYSON BRIXNER GRANTED ** SEE ORDER **; Notes:SMALL DTD 8/19/19: PLT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF TYSON BRIXNER GRANTED ** SEE ORDER **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:OF DEPOSITION TO: RENARA CESAR AUGUST 22, 2019 @ 10:00 AM F/B PLTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:OF DEPOSITION OF BELINDA HERNANDEZ AUGUST 22, 2019 @ 11:00 AM F/B PLTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY AS TO PLTS EXPERT DAVID GOLDSTEIN MD WILL BE AVAILABLE ON NOVEMBER 1 THROUGH 8, 2019 F/B PLTS ATTY; Notes:OF AVAILABILITY AS TO PLTS EXPERT DAVID GOLDSTEIN MD WILL BE AVAILABLE ON NOVEMBER 1 THROUGH 8, 2019 F/B PLTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT STEVEN BECKER MD WILL BE AVAO;AB;E NOVEMBER 1, 6. 8, 13 AND 15, 2019 F/B PLTS ATTY; Notes:OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT STEVEN BECKER MD WILL BE AVAO;AB;E NOVEMBER 1, 6. 8, 13 AND 15, 2019 F/B PLTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT BERNARD PETTINGILL PHD WILL BE AVAILABLE ON OCTOBER 3, 8 OR 29, 2019 @ 10:00 AM AND DECEMBER 3, 5, 10 AND 12, 2019 @ 10:00 AM F/B PLTS ATTY; Notes:OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT BERNARD PETTINGILL PHD WILL BE AVAILABLE ON OCTOBER 3, 8 OR 29, 2019 @ 10:00 AM AND DECEMBER 3, 5, 10 AND 12, 2019 @ 10:00 AM F/B PLTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT CRAIG LICHTBLAU MD WILL BE AVAILABLE SEPTEMBER 23 AND 24, 2019 @ 5:00 PM, OCTOBER 2, 10, 15, 23 AND 24, 2019 @ 4:00 PM AND DECEMBER 18 AND 19, 2019 @ 4:00 PM F/B PTLS ATTY; Notes:OF AVAILABILITY OF PLTS EXPERT CRAIG LICHTBLAU MD WILL BE AVAILABLE SEPTEMBER 23 AND 24, 2019 @ 5:00 PM, OCTOBER 2, 10, 15, 23 AND 24, 2019 @ 4:00 PM AND DECEMBER 18 AND 19, 2019 @ 4:00 PM F/B PTLS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY PLTS EXPERT JACK FRANASZEK MD WILL BE AVAILABLE OCTOBER 2 AND 3, 2019 AND NOVEMBER 21, 2019. F/B PLTS TTY; Notes:OF AVAILABILITY PLTS EXPERT JACK FRANASZEK MD WILL BE AVAILABLE OCTOBER 2 AND 3, 2019 AND NOVEMBER 21, 2019. F/B PLTS TTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY AS TO PLTS EXPERT MICHAEL APSTEIN MD WILL BE AVAILABLE NOVEMBER 1, 2019 F/B PLTS ATTY; Notes:OF AVAILABILITY AS TO PLTS EXPERT MICHAEL APSTEIN MD WILL BE AVAILABLE NOVEMBER 1, 2019 F/B PLTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Notes:REGARDING INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLT WITH RONALD TOLCHIN DO F/B DFTS JFK MEDICAL CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, JAMES JUSTIN GOAD, MD, THE CENTER FOR ADVANCED SURGICAL CARE, CHADWICK RASTATTER, MD, THE CENTER FOR ADVANCED SURGICAL CARE, AVIV KAT DO AND DIGESTIVE DISEASE CENTER OF THE PALM BEACHES ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Due Date:11/20/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less