This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 11:59:38 (UTC).

BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC. A/A/O RICARDO WILSON AND SASHANA WILSON V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC A/A/O RICARDO WILSON AND SASHANA WILSON filed an Other lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BRICKHOUSE INSPECTIONS INC. A/A/O RICARDO WILSON AND SASHANA WILSON

Defendant and Respondent

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

DOLCE , GREGORIE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MARGRE , GREGG

BADIAVAS , CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/27/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/27/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/27/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4661639

10/28/2022:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4661639

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4678554

11/15/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4678554

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/30/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/09/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/20/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/10/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: (AMENDED) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B GREGG MARGRE OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B C BADIAVAS OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4678554; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/15/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4678554; Notes: $10.00 4678554 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@ilgpa.com;service@restorationlaw.com AS TO DFT EMAILED TO PLTS ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4661639; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/28/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4661639; Notes: $300.00 4661639 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: FIRST/TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVING FIRST SET OF/TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY GREGORIE DOLCE OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less