This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 09/23/2021 at 18:37:18 (UTC).

BOYNTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC., A FLORIDA CORP. (A/A/O ISIDOR, UMENE) V 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 BOYNTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC , A FLORIDA CORP A/A/O ISIDOR, UMENE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOYNTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC., A FLORIDA CORP. (A/A/O ISIDOR, UMENE)

Defendant and Respondent

21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TUCCITTO ESQ, CHRISTOPHER M

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/17/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4174891

09/14/2021:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4174891

SUMMONS REQUESTED

09/13/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

COMPLAINT

09/13/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/13/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:MB; Room:4C (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED 21ST CENTURY CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY - 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4174891; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/14/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/14/2021; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@FLADVOCATES.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 10/19/2021 11:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 10/19/2021 11:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4174891; Notes:$65.00 4174891 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boynton Beach Medical Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCCITTO, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL