This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/19/2023 at 23:31:36 (UTC).

BOUCHER, KEVIN V OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 BOUCHER, KEVIN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL , CAROLYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL , CAROLYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOUCHER , KEVIN

Defendant and Respondent

OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WEBB , PARIS R

PAULSEN , DARA

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

VICARY , PAUL S

 

Court Documents

NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

12/07/2022:NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/06/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/05/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

11/30/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/22/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

11/17/2022:NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

MOTION FOR ORDER

11/17/2022:MOTION FOR ORDER

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

11/17/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

11/17/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/15/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/21/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/17/2022:REQUEST FOR COPIES

RESPONSE TO: PLT'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFSNES, F/B DEFT

10/11/2022:RESPONSE TO: PLT'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFSNES, F/B DEFT

MOTION TO STRIKE

10/10/2022:MOTION TO STRIKE

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

10/10/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF INTENT

10/05/2022:NOTICE OF INTENT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/07/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

09/26/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes: OF FIRM NAME AND ATTY, ELECTRONIC MAIL DESIGNATION AND INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE SERVICE LIST F/B ATTY PAULSEN OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING 02/08/2023 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES 1ECDM CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE FOR SFR CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE, LLC 03/29/2023 10:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF ELITE CLAIMS CONSULTANTS 02/06/2023 10:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Notes: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER; Notes: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN EX PARTE ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION KEVIN BOUCHER 01/13/2023 10:00:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4603254; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/07/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/07/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4603254; Notes: $411.00 4603254 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@insurancelawyers.org;paris@insurancelawyers.org AS TO OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less