This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 23:07:43 (UTC).

BOGAN, STEVE V EAN HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 BOGAN, STEVE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

BOGAN , JEANETTE MELBA

BOGAN , STEVE

Defendant and Respondent

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

HOWE , JOHN M

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KING , DAVID V

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/27/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4517051

06/28/2022:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4517051

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4521896

07/01/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4521896

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/25/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/25/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: FILED BY ATTY KINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT FILED BY ATTY KINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED EAN HOLDINGS, LLC - 07/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4521896; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/01/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4521896; Notes: $10.00 4521896 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4517051; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/28/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: JHOWE@JOHNHOWELAW.COM;JEMERSON@JOHNHOWELAW.COM;ASSISTANT@JOHNHOWELAW.COM AS TO DFT EAN HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4517051; Notes: $401.00 4517051 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWE , JOHN M