This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 05:24:36 (UTC).

BOCA WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC V ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS,SPOUSES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES , LIENORS ,, CREDITORS , TRUSTEES OT CLAIMANTS BY AMD THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST KIMBERLY M BIONDI DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 BOCA WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS,SPOUSES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES , LIENORS ,, CREDITORS , TRUSTEES OT CLAIMANTS BY AMD THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST KIMBERLY M BIONDI DECEASED. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BOCA WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS,SPOUSES, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES , LIENORS ,, CREDITORS , TRUSTEES OT CLAIMANTS BY AMD THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST KIMBERLY M BIONDI DECEASED

TENANT , UNKONWN

THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI

UNKNOWN TENANT N/K/A PASQUALE NARICCI

Guardian Ad Litem

TOTH , DINNA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SUGARMAN , DEBORAH S

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S DEFAULT

01/31/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/19/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/03/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4285271

12/17/2021:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4285271

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

CLERK'S DEFAULT

12/13/2021:CLERK'S DEFAULT

AGREED ORDER HARPER DTD 12/10/21: PLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT GRANTED CLERK DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI

12/10/2021:AGREED ORDER HARPER DTD 12/10/21: PLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT GRANTED CLERK DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI

COMPLAINT

12/01/2021:COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/01/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

REPORT

11/23/2021:REPORT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/18/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

10/14/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

10/12/2021:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/12/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/07/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

10/06/2021:NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

09/28/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

ORDER APPOINTING GDN AD LITEM

09/22/2021:ORDER APPOINTING GDN AD LITEM

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; KGREEN@KBRLEGAL.COM AS TO ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR DEFAULT DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI - 12/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4285271; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$426.60; total Amount Paid:$426.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4285271; Notes:$10.00 4285271 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@kbrlegal.com;kgreen@kbrlegal.com AS TO DFT ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:EFILINGS@KBRLEGAL.COM; KGREEN@KBRLEGAL.COM AS TO DFT UNKNOWN TENANT N/K/A PASQUALE NARICCI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER HARPER DTD 12/10/21: PLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT GRANTED CLERK DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI; Notes:HARPER DTD 12/10/21: PLT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT GRANTED CLERK DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONS FOR THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DAWN MUNSON-BIONDI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4176175; Receipt Amount: $416.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/15/2021; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/15/2021; Description:800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $416.60 ON RECEIPT 4176175; Notes:$416.60 4176175 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Efilings@KBRLegal.com;AEisenberg@KBRLegal.com AS TO UKNOWN TENANT EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32883 PAGE 1125-1125; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOCA WOODS PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deborah S Sugarman