This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/27/2022 at 19:09:09 (UTC).

BOCA REAL APARTMENTS V ISAZA, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 BOCA REAL APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ISAZA, CARLOS. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BOCA REAL APARTMENTS

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

Defendant and Respondent

ISAZA , CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/17/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

11/17/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4683817

11/18/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4683817

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/28/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

11/30/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

11/30/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/30/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

12/07/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34012 PAGE 243-243

12/08/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34012 PAGE 243-243

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34012 PAGE 243-243; Notes: FOR POSSESSION AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO "CLOSE" THE FILE - SIGNED JUDGE SILVER 12/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM TO CARLOS ISAZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY CLERK AGAINST CARLOS ISAZA F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: F/B PLT - CARLOS ISAZA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CARLOS ISAZA - 11/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4683817; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/18/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/18/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4683817; Notes: $195.00 4683817 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment LLC, 21st Avenue is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JERRON KELLEY