This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/14/2020 at 19:15:48 (UTC).

BETH WILLIAMS D.C. P.A. D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTER A/A/O WANDA KIRBY V METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 BETH WILLIAMS D C P A D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTER A/A/O WANDA KIRBY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BETH WILLIAMS D.C. P.A. D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE CENTER A/A/O WANDA KIRBY

Defendant and Respondent

METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BOTTARI , DANIEL B

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3698538

07/30/2020:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3698538

SUMMONS REQUESTED

07/29/2020:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 3678948

07/10/2020:PAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 3678948

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/10/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:#6 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3698538; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/30/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@BOTTARIANDDOYLE.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3698538; Notes:$10.00 3698538 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3678948; Receipt Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 9/1/2020 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 9/1/2020 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 3678948; Notes:$55.00 3678948 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less