This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/12/2023 at 01:06:06 (UTC).

BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O SHANEKA SEAY V GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O SHANEKA SEAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O SHANEKA SEAY

Defendant and Respondent

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOYLE , CONOR J.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/21/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/21/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4688150

11/22/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4688150

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4688150; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/22/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@BOTTARIANDDOYLE.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/10/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/10/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4688150; Notes: $65.00 4688150 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less