This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/08/2023 at 02:43:24 (UTC).

BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O NURIA MENDEZ V PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O NURIA MENDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O NURIA MENDEZ

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOYLE , CONOR J.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GUINEA , ULISES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/21/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/21/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4687944

11/22/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4687944

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

12/22/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

SUMMONS REQUESTED

02/28/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4798657

03/02/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4798657

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/02/2023:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE

03/08/2023:ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/09/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FB DFT- TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

03/30/2023:MOTION FB DFT- TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR:

03/30/2023:DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/30/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

04/05/2023:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (STIPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: FB DFT'S ATTY ULISES GUINEA AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Notes: FB DFT- JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FB DFT- TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: FB DFT- TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUBSTITUTE PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - 03/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING SERVICE; Notes: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT(S) ODS FRANK S. CASTOR 03/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4798657; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $75.00; total Amount Paid: $75.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/02/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLTF ATTY PRES, DFT NP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4687944; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/22/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@BOTTARIANDDOYLE.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 12/22/2022 10:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 12/22/2022 10:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4687944; Notes: $65.00 4687944 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less