This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/06/2023 at 14:43:52 (UTC).

BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O BRANDIE GABRIEL V GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O BRANDIE GABRIEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BETH WILLIAMS DC PA D/B/A CORNERSTONE HEALTHCARE A/A/O BRANDIE GABRIEL

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

DOYLE , CONOR J.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GIDDENS , JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/21/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/21/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4688076

11/22/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4688076

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

01/10/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/19/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4752501

01/24/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4752501

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2023:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/03/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/07/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/17/2023:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

02/17/2023:DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

02/21/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER; Notes: ORDER ON AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN, ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE, AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL AND MEDIATION PROCEDURES 1/19/2024 AT 9:30 A.M. - SIGNED JUDGE SILVER 2/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (STIPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS F/B JONATHAN GIDDENS OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SERVED ON GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY ON 2/3/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4752501; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $75.00; total Amount Paid: $75.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/24/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@BOTTARIANDDOYLE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4688076; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/22/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@BOTTARIANDDOYLE.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/10/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/10/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4688076; Notes: $65.00 4688076 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less