This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/19/2022 at 19:00:11 (UTC).

BEST ONE RESTORATION LLC AAO ZURAMA PALANCO V CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 BEST ONE RESTORATION LLC AAO ZURAMA PALANCO filed an Other lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BEST ONE RESTORATION LLC AAO ZURAMA PALANCO

Defendant and Respondent

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN , WEISSER

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

TEDESCO , JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/09/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/09/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/09/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/09/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/09/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4608817

09/12/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4608817

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/04/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/11/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B JENNIFER H TEDESCO ESQ OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4608817; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/12/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4608817; Notes: $310.00 4608817 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: kw@weklaw.com;jk@weklaw.com;service@weklaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISSER KEVIN