This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 21:02:32 (UTC).

BEST ONE RESTORATION, LLC (A/A/O ROBERT ANDINO) V CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 BEST ONE RESTORATION, LLC A/A/O ROBERT ANDINO filed an Other lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BEST ONE RESTORATION, LLC (A/A/O ROBERT ANDINO)

Defendant and Respondent

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

STEADMAN , ANDREW A

CAFARO , JOSEPH

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

RODRIGUEZ , ZASHA M

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT 502023CA0079

01/31/2023:RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT 502023CA0079

RECEIPT OF TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT CIVIL

01/25/2023:RECEIPT OF TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT CIVIL

CORRESPONDENCE REQUEST FOR FEES

01/20/2023:CORRESPONDENCE REQUEST FOR FEES

ORDER OF TRANSFER

01/17/2023:ORDER OF TRANSFER

NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

01/09/2023:NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE

MOTION FB PLT- TO TRANSFER

01/09/2023:MOTION FB PLT- TO TRANSFER

ORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

01/09/2023:ORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/27/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF MULTIPLE ACTIONS F/B DFT

12/27/2022:NOTICE OF MULTIPLE ACTIONS F/B DFT

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/27/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

12/19/2022:STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF SUB OF COUNSEL

12/15/2022:NOTICE OF SUB OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

12/09/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/09/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4692754

11/28/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4692754

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/22/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/22/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT 502023CA0079; Notes: TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT 502023CA0079

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT CIVIL; Notes: TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE REQUEST FOR FEES; Notes: JC@WEKLAW.COM; MA@WEKLAW.COM; SERVICE@WEKLAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDO NOT DOCKET ON THIS CASE; Notes: TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT DIVISION AK 22CA9306

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED - OTHER; Notes: DO - DISPOSED OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF TRANSFER; Notes: DIVISION AK 2022CA009306 - SIGNED JUDGE SHULLMAN 1/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes: FB PLT- WITHIN FIRM AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FB PLT- TO TRANSFER; Notes: FB PLT- TO TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL; Notes: JUDGE SHULLMAN ON 1/8/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: & RESERVATION OF JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/28/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/28/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4692754; Notes: $310.00 4692754 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: kw@weklaw.com;jk@weklaw.com;service@weklaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less