This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/18/2022 at 15:31:54 (UTC).

BEST ONE RESTORATION, LLC (A/A/O ELIZABETH GONZALEZ) V CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 BEST ONE RESTORATION, LLC A/A/O ELIZABETH GONZALEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BEST ONE RESTORATION, LLC (A/A/O ELIZABETH GONZALEZ)

Respondent and Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WEISSER , KEVIN

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

TRUSHIN ESQ, BRADLEY H

 

Court Documents

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

10/14/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON DEFENDANT'S EXCUSABLE INABILITY TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

10/12/2022:AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON DEFENDANT'S EXCUSABLE INABILITY TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - JUDGE SHULLMAN 10/12/22

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/07/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/07/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON DEFENDANTS EXCUSABLE INABILITY TO APPEAR AT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE F/B DFT

10/07/2022:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON DEFENDANTS EXCUSABLE INABILITY TO APPEAR AT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE F/B DFT

ORDER OF DEFAULT

10/06/2022:ORDER OF DEFAULT

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

10/06/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/04/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4605701

09/16/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4605701

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4605701

09/08/2022:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4605701

SUMMONS REQUESTED

09/07/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/07/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/07/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

09/07/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/07/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

09/07/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: JOINT-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON DEFENDANT'S EXCUSABLE INABILITY TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - JUDGE SHULLMAN 10/12/22; Notes: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON DEFENDANT'S EXCUSABLE INABILITY TO APPEAR AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - JUDGE SHULLMAN 10/12/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F.B D VILLALOBOS OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F.B D VILLALOBOS OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON DEFENDANTS EXCUSABLE INABILITY TO APPEAR AT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE F/B DFT; Notes: FOR LEAVE TO FILE STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE BASED ON DEFENDANTS EXCUSABLE INABILITY TO APPEAR AT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6M (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Notes: AND ORDER TO ADVVANCE THE CAUSE WITHIN 45 DAYS - SIGNED JUDGE SHULLMAN 10/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT ATTY PRESENT DFT NO APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION - 09/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4605701; Receipt Amount: $320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 10/6/2022 9:30 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 10/6/2022 9:30 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4605701; Notes: $320.00 4605701 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6) F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVICE OF FIRST/TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISSER , KEVIN